404 Not Found

Görüntülemeye çalıştığınız sayfa bulunamadı. Bu sayfa ya yayından kaldırılmış ya da hiç yayınlanmamış :)
Lütfen geldiğiniz yeri kontrol ediniz ya da aşağıdan arama yaparak istediğiniz sayfaya gidiniz.

Shortcut methods for Bank Quantitative Aptitude Questions? - Quantitative/Arithematic
 
 
 

Reply to Thread
Page 1 of 2 12 LastLast
Results 1 to 5 of 9
Like Tree11Likes

Shortcut methods for Bank Quantitative Aptitude Questions?

This is a discussion on Shortcut methods for Bank Quantitative Aptitude Questions? within the Quantitative/Arithematic forums, part of the Study Material and Resources category; Shortcut methods for Bank QA 1)To square any number ended wid 5 e.g. 65*65 solution: 1)Square R.H.S of given no.i.e. 5*5=25 2)Multiply the L.H.S no. by 1 more i.e.6*7=42 3)concatenate answers of step2 and step1 ...

      
  1. #1
    Assistant Manager Sharad Jain is on a distinguished road Sharad Jain's Avatar
    Join Date
    Jan 2012
    Gender:
    Location
    A, A
    Posts
    19

    Wink Shortcut methods for Bank Quantitative Aptitude Questions?



    Shortcut methods for Bank QA


    1)To square any number ended wid 5
    e.g. 65*65
    solution: 1)Square R.H.S of given no.i.e. 5*5=25
    2)Multiply the L.H.S no. by 1 more
    i.e.6*7=42
    3)concatenate answers of step2 and step1
    i.e. 42 and 25 =4225
    so SQUARE of 65 = 4225.








    2)To square any number between 30 to 70
    Square of 52
    a)Subtract 52 from 50 i.e 52-50=02
    b)Add it wid 25 i.e. 25 02 = 27
    c)now square the result of step a
    i.e. 02*02 = 04
    d)Now merge the answer of b and c
    i.e. 27 and 04 so it become 2704
    square of 52 is 2704.
    for number less than 50 only we have to change step b rather to add we subtract the result of step a by 25 in step b
    note in case of 62 where
    in step a) as 62-50 =12
    step b)25 12 = 37
    step c)12*12=144
    step d) merge it as
    37
    144
    answer is: 3844




    3) How to multiply any no.with 11
    e.g.
    23543456*11 = 258978016
    a)write 1st and last digit as it is
    b)now add all consecutive no. and write it in
    between 1st and last digit also use concept of
    carry add from right side of number
    2(2 3)(3 5)(5 4)(4 3)(3 4( 1carry))(4 5( 1carry))
    (5 6)6 = 258978016

    perhaps i think u can understand the above trick or it will be in long term in ur mind



    Last edited by RPS; 05-04-2012 at 12:23 PM.
    RPS, amit, nani1433 and 1 others like this.
    [B]SHARAD JAIN PRODUCTION[/B

  2. #2
    Active Member amit is on a distinguished road amit's Avatar
    Join Date
    Aug 2011
    Posts
    114
    Blog Entries
    2
    My Mood
    Cheerful


    square of any TWO DIGIT NUMBER number

    say 24^2
    CONSIDER 24 AS AB
    step I - B^2
    STEP II- 2*A*B + ANY CARRIED FORWARD OF STEP Ist
    step III A^2 +CARRIED FORWARD OF STEP IInd

    lets take 24^2
    STEP I- 4^2 = 16 WRITE 6 AND ONE CARRY FORWARD TO NEXT STEP 6
    STEP II 2*2*4 +1( CARRY FORWARD OF STEP iST) 17 WRITE 7 AND 1 CARRY FORWARD 7
    STEP III 2^2 +1 CARRY FORWARD OF STEP II 5
    ============
    24^2 ANS 576
    RPS, nani1433 and jamunabalan like this.

  3. #3
    Active Member Amar042 is on a distinguished road Amar042's Avatar
    Join Date
    Nov 2011
    Gender:
    Location
    Bangalore
    Posts
    113
    My Mood
    Cheeky


    Thanks for sharing.

  4. #4
    Moderator nani1433 is on a distinguished road nani1433's Avatar
    Join Date
    Oct 2011
    Gender:
    Location
    Vizag
    Posts
    140
    Blog Entries
    1
    My Mood
    Stressed


    Quote Originally Posted by Sharad Jain View Post
    Shortcut methods for Bank QA


    1)To square any number ended wid 5
    e.g. 65*65
    solution: 1)Square R.H.S of given no.i.e. 5*5=25
    2)Multiply the L.H.S no. by 1 more
    i.e.6*7=42
    3)concatenate answers of step2 and step1
    i.e. 42 and 25 =4225
    so SQUARE of 65 = 4225.






    2)To square any number between 30 to 70
    Square of 52
    a)Subtract 52 from 50 i.e 52-50=02
    b)Add it wid 25 i.e. 25 02 = 27
    c)now square the result of step a
    i.e. 02*02 = 04
    d)Now merge the answer of b and c
    i.e. 27 and 04 so it become 2704
    square of 52 is 2704.
    for number less than 50 only we have to change step b rather to add we subtract the result of step a by 25 in step b
    note in case of 62 where
    in step a) as 62-50 =12
    step b)25 12 = 37
    step c)12*12=144
    step d) merge it as
    37
    144
    answer is: 3844




    3) How to multiply any no.with 11
    e.g.
    23543456*11 = 258978016
    a)write 1st and last digit as it is
    b)now add all consecutive no. and write it in
    between 1st and last digit also use concept of
    carry add from right side of number
    2(2 3)(3 5)(5 4)(4 3)(3 4( 1carry))(4 5( 1carry))
    (5 6)6 = 258978016


    perhaps i think u can understand the above trick or it will be in long term in ur mind



    Can you please the change the color of the font. Unable to read.
    nimish.sukhdeve likes this.

  5. #5
    Active Member narender is on a distinguished road narender's Avatar
    Join Date
    Sep 2011
    Gender:
    Location
    Gurgaon
    Posts
    62
    My Mood
    In Love


    Thanks a lot for sharing valuable information...

Facebook Comments


Visitors found this page by searching for:

shortcuts to solve quantitative aptitude questions

shortcut methods for quantitative aptitude pdf

quantitative aptitude shortcut methods pdf

quantitative aptitude tricks and shortcuts pdfquantitative aptitude shortcut methodsshortcut methods for quantitative aptitude for bank examsnumerical aptitude shortcutsshortcut method for quantitative aptitude in bank examshortcuts for quantitative aptitudequick aptitude tricksshortcuts for aptitudeshortcut methods to solve quantitative aptitudeshort-cut techniques in quantitative aptitudequantitative aptitude techniquesaptitude shortcut techniquesshortcut tricks for quantitative aptitudetricks to solve aptitude questions pdfshortcut methods to solve quantitative aptitude pdfshortcut method of neumerical apptitudeshortcuts for solving quantitative aptitude questionsquantitative aptitude questions for bank exams pdfshortcuts solve quantitative aptitude questionstricks to solve quantitative aptitude questionstricks for solving quantitative aptitude questionsquantitative aptitude short tricks pdfquantitative aptitude pdf for bank examsshort cut methods in quantitative aptitudeshortcut methods quantitative aptitude bank examsshortcuts to solve aptitude questionsshortcut method to solve quantitative aptitudechort cut methods of bank quantitative aptitudestricks for solving quantitative aptitude questions pdfshortcuts for quantitative aptitude pdftricks for solving aptitude questionsshortcut for quantitative examsibps exam question with methodsshortcut to solve quantitative aptitudeshort cut methods of quantitative aptitudeshort tricks for quantitative aptitudeshortcuts for aptitude questionsshortcuts in quantitative aptitudeshort cut methods for aptitude numerical problems for banksshortcut method for quantitative aptitudeshort cut methods in quantitative aptitude pdfaptitude tricks pdfshortcuts quantitative aptitudeshortcut for solving qauantitative apptitude for bank potricks for quantitative aptitude pdfshort tricks for solving quantitative aptitudeshortcut method to solve quantitative apptitude problems

Tags for this Thread

Bookmarks

Posting Permissions

  • You may not post new threads
  • You may not post replies
  • You may not post attachments
  • You may not edit your posts